US SB1011 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Natural Gas Act to provide for expanded natural gas exports.
Title
Natural Gas Export Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2705 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB6748 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB7094 (Related) 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3762 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6748 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB7094 (Related) 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3762 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1011/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1011/BILLS-117s1011is.pdf |