US SB3354 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-267.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-267.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018
Title
Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-11 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-267. |
2018-10-11 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-10-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-28 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9358-9359) |
2018-09-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9358-9359) |
2018-09-28 | House | Mr. Guthrie asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-09-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-09-28 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-09-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.4024 Amendment SA 4024 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.4024 Amendment SA 4024 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S6364) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6364) |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5694) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1808 (Related) 2017-05-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4601 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1312 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
HB4601 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1312 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.