US SB3282 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Sea Grant College Program Amendments Act of 2016 (Sec. 3) This bill amends the National Sea Grant College Program Act to reauthorize through FY2021 the National Sea Grant College Program. The bill requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to award Dean John A. Knauss Marine Policy Fellowships. Currently, NOAA has discretion in awarding such fellowships. Those fellowships support the placement of graduate students in fields related to ocean, coastal, and Great Lakes resources in positions with the executive and legislative branches. (Sec. 4) NOAA must establish priorities for the use of donations given for the National Sea Grant Program. (Sec. 8) An agency may appoint a recipient of a Dean John A. Knauss Marine Policy Fellowship to a federal position within two years after such recipient successfully completes a fellowship. (Sec. 9) The bill authorizes through FY2021 grants for university research on: (1) the biology, prevention, and control of aquatic nonnative species; (2) oyster diseases, oyster restoration, and oyster-related human health risks; (3) the biology, prevention, and forecasting of harmful algal blooms; and (4) sustainable aquaculture techniques and technologies. The bill also authorizes through FY2021 grants for: (1) fishery extension activities conducted by sea grant colleges or sea grant institutes to enhance existing core program funding; and (2) priority issues identified in the National Sea Grant Program's strategic plan.
Title
National Sea Grant College Program Amendments Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2016-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-07-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5182-5183; text as passed Senate: CR S5182-5183) |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Agricultural research
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Great Lakes
Higher education
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Seafood
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Agricultural research
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Great Lakes
Higher education
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Seafood
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs