US SB3277 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 239 - 137 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H10560-10566)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 239 - 137 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H10560-10566)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Space Frontier Act of 2018
Title
Space Frontier Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 485 (Y: 239 N: 137 NV: 56 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 239 - 137 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H10560-10566) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10572) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3277. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10560-10567) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-20 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7966-7970; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7966-7970) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.4176 Amendment SA 4176 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.4176 Amendment SA 4176 proposed by Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S7900) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 686. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-397. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
International scientific cooperation
Licensing and registrations
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Science, technology, communications
Small business
Space flight and exploration
Spacecraft and satellites
Transportation safety and security
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
International scientific cooperation
Licensing and registrations
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Science, technology, communications
Small business
Space flight and exploration
Spacecraft and satellites
Transportation safety and security