US SB3182 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to continue through at least FY2020 and report on the Women's Health Transition Training pilot program. Among other elements, the report should include the number of female participants by military department, the number of courses held under the program, and the locations where the courses were held.
Title
HEALTH Act Helping Expand and Launch Transitional Health for Women Veterans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 415. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2942 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate.
HB2752 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB318 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB2752 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB318 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Internet and video services
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Internet and video services
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Women's health