US SB318 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Save Our Seas 2.0 Act to improve the administration of the Marine Debris Foundation, to amend the Marine Debris Act to improve the administration of the Marine Debris Program of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
Save Our Seas 2.0 Amendments Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-12-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5967-5968; text: CR S5967-5968) |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262. |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB886 (Related) 2024-03-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346.