US HB886 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Save Our Seas 2.0 Act to improve the administration of the Marine Debris Foundation, to amend the Marine Debris Act to improve the administration of the Marine Debris Program of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
Save Our Seas 2.0 Amendments Act
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 80 (Y: 326 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346. |
2024-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 326 - 73 (Roll no. 80). (text: CR H1076-1077) |
2024-03-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1080-1081) |
2024-03-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-03-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 886. |
2024-03-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1076-1078) |
2024-03-11 | House | Mr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154. |
2023-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-167, Part II. |
2023-08-25 | House | House Committee on Natural Resources Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 30, 2023. |
2023-08-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-167, Part I. |
2023-05-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 55 - 9. |
2023-05-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-05-23 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged |
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. |
2023-03-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB318 (Related) 2023-12-15 - Held at the desk.