DE HB264 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on August 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on August 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes the crime of patronizing a prostitute a class E felony rather than a misdemeanor where the person from whom prostitution is sought is a minor.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Patronizing A Prostitute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-18 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2024-03-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2023-12-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |