US SB3093 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keep Families Together and Enforce the Law Act
Title
Keep Families Together and Enforce the Law Act
Sponsors
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6181 (Related) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB6190 (Same As) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB3478 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6190 (Same As) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB3478 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Family relationships
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Specialized courts
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Family relationships
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Specialized courts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3093/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3093/BILLS-115s3093pcs.pdf |