US SB2946 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on October 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on October 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018
Title
Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-253. |
2018-10-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-09-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8245) |
2018-09-13 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8245) |
2018-09-13 | House | Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-08-24 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-08-24 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5864-5865; text: CR S5864-5865) |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 514. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2926-2927) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5954 (Same As) 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 527.