US SB2906 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

VA MISSION Act of 2018 VA Maintaining Internal Systems and Strengthening Integrated Outside Networks Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VA MISSION Act of 2018 VA Maintaining Internal Systems and Strengthening Integrated Outside Networks Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1848 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2123 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB4132 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
HB5830 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB925 (Related) 2018-01-05 - Held at the desk.
SB1873 (Related) 2018-01-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
HB1058 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB1133 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3832 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB114 (Related) 2017-08-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-46. (TXT | PDF)
SB115 (Related) 2017-07-11 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1319 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2807 (Related) 2018-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects

Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
California
Congressional oversight
Dental care
Department of Veterans Affairs
District of Columbia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Federal officials
Georgia
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Ohio
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Rural conditions and development
South Carolina
Student aid and college costs
Surgery and anesthesia
Tennessee
Texas
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
West Virginia
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback