US HB1133 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 69-11)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Transplant Coverage Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 to authorize the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) provide for an operation on a live donor to carry out a transplant procedure for an eligible veteran, notwithstanding that the live donor may not be eligible for VA health care, and (2) provide for such an operation at a VA facility or a non-VA facility that has an agreement with the VA. (The live donor shall be deemed to be an individual eligible for hospital care and medical services at a non-VA facility pursuant to such an agreement solely for the purposes of receiving such operation, care, and services.) Subject to fund availability, the VA shall furnish to such a donor any care or services that may be required before and after conducting such procedure.
Title
Veterans Transplant Coverage Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-07 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8553) |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1133. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8553-8554) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 289. |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-393. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB115 (Related) 2017-07-11 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-320.
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
SB2193 (Related) 2018-03-07 - By Senator Isakson from Committee on Veterans' Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-212.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
SB2193 (Related) 2018-03-07 - By Senator Isakson from Committee on Veterans' Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-212.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Surgery and anesthesia
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Surgery and anesthesia
Veterans' medical care