US SB925 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
VETS Act of 2017 Veterans E-Health and Telemedicine Support Act of 2017 This bill allows a licensed health care professional of the Department of Veterans Affairs to practice his or her profession using telemedicine at any location in any state, regardless of where the professional or patient is located.
Title
VETS Act of 2017 Veterans E-Health and Telemedicine Support Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-01-05 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.1868 Amendment SA 1868 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.1868 Amendment SA 1868 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Ernst. (consideration: CR S25; text: CR S25) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S25) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1152 (Related) 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2123 (Same As) 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2193 (Related) 2018-03-07 - By Senator Isakson from Committee on Veterans' Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-212.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
HB4242 (Related) 2018-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444.
HB2123 (Same As) 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2193 (Related) 2018-03-07 - By Senator Isakson from Committee on Veterans' Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-212.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
HB4242 (Related) 2018-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Veterans' medical care