US HB4242 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VA Care in the Community Act
Title
VA Care in the Community Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444. |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-585. |
2017-12-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 14 - 9. |
2017-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-19 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1445 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2123 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB4132 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6066 (Related) 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 807.
SB115 (Related) 2017-07-11 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-320.
SB925 (Related) 2018-01-05 - Held at the desk.
SB2134 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2123 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB4132 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6066 (Related) 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 807.
SB115 (Related) 2017-07-11 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-320.
SB925 (Related) 2018-01-05 - Held at the desk.
SB2134 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Aging
American Samoa
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Caribbean area
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Dental care
Department of Veterans Affairs
District of Columbia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Guam
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical ethics
Medicare
Mental health
Military medicine
Northern Mariana Islands
Ohio
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
Right of privacy
South Carolina
Student aid and college costs
Surgery and anesthesia
Tennessee
Texas
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care
Virgin Islands
West Virginia
American Samoa
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Caribbean area
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Dental care
Department of Veterans Affairs
District of Columbia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Guam
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical ethics
Medicare
Mental health
Military medicine
Northern Mariana Islands
Ohio
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
Right of privacy
South Carolina
Student aid and college costs
Surgery and anesthesia
Tennessee
Texas
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care
Virgin Islands
West Virginia