US HB6066 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 807.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 807.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the productivity of the management of Department of Veterans Affairs health care, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the productivity of the management of Department of Veterans Affairs health care, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 807. |
2018-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1034. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4242 (Related) 2018-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medical education
Performance measurement
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medical education
Performance measurement
Veterans' medical care