US SB1319 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Care Core Competency Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish a program to furnish continuing medical education material to non-VA medical professionals, with the goal of: (1) increasing knowledge and recognition of medical conditions common to veterans, and (2) improving outreach to veterans and family members. The program must include education on: (1) dealing with patients who are veterans or family members; (2) identifying and treating common mental and physical conditions of veterans and family members; and (3) the VA health care system. The VA shall: (1) carry out such program for five years on a VA website at no cost to participating non-VA medical professionals, and (2) ensure that the program is accredited in as many states as practicable.
Title
Community Care Core Competency Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2193 (Related) 2018-03-07 - By Senator Isakson from Committee on Veterans' Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-212.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Internet and video services
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
Internet and video services
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1319/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1319/BILLS-115s1319is.pdf |