US SB284 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act (Sec. 3) This bill authorizes the President to impose U.S. entry and property sanctions against any foreign person (or entity) who: is responsible for extrajudicial killings, torture, or other gross violations of internationally recognized human rights committed against individuals in any foreign country seeking to expose illegal activity carried out by government officials, or to obtain, exercise, or promote human rights and freedoms; acted as an agent of or on behalf of a foreign person in such activities; is a government official or senior associate of such official responsible for, or complicit in, ordering or otherwise directing acts of significant corruption, including the expropriation of private or public assets for personal gain, corruption related to government contracts or the extraction of natural resources, bribery, or the facilitation or transfer of the proceeds of corruption to foreign jurisdictions; or has materially assisted or provided financial, material, or technological support for, or goods or services in support of, such activities. The authority to block and prohibit transactions in property and property interests shall not include the authority to impose sanctions on the importation of goods (any article, natural or man made substance, material, supply or manufactured product, including inspection and test equipment, excluding technical data). The President shall, after receiving a request from the chairperson and ranking member of one of the appropriate congressional committees with respect to whether a foreign person has engaged in a prohibited activity: determine if the person has engaged in such an activity; and report to the chairperson and ranking member whether or not the President imposed or intends to impose specified sanctions against the person. Sanctions shall not apply to an individual as necessary for law enforcement purposes, or to comply with the Agreement between the United Nations (U.N.) and the United States regarding the U.N. Headquarters or other applicable international obligations of the United States. The President may terminate sanctions under specified conditions. The Assistant Secretary of State for Democracy, Human Rights, and Labor may submit to the Department of State the names of foreign persons who may meet the sanctions criteria. (Sec. 4) The President shall report to Congress annually regarding each foreign person sanctioned, the type of sanctions imposed, and the reason for their imposition.
Title
Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-12-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-12-18 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-12-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2937 Amendment SA 2937 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2937 Amendment SA 2937 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S8836) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8836) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8835-8836; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S8835-8836) |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 174. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment. Without written report. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB624 (Related) 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Sanctions
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Sanctions
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers