US HB624 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act Directs the President to impose U.S. entry and property sanctions against any foreign person (or entity) who: is responsible for extrajudicial killings, torture, or other gross violations of internationally recognized human rights committed against individuals in any foreign country, especially those persons seeking to expose illegal activity carried out by government officials, or to obtain, exercise, or promote human rights and freedoms; acted as an agent of or on behalf of a foreign person in such activities; is a government official (or senior associate of such official) responsible for, or complicit in, ordering or otherwise directing acts of significant corruption or the facilitation or transfer of the proceeds of corruption to foreign jurisdictions; or has materially assisted or provided financial, material, or technological support for, or goods or services in support of, such activities. Prescribes related penalties. Authorizes the President, with regard to such sanctions, to: waive their application, with prior congressional notification, if in U.S. national security interests; and terminate them under specified conditions. States that sanctions shall not apply if necessary to comply with the Agreement between the United Nations (U.N.) and the United States regarding the U.N. Headquarters, or other applicable international obligations of the United States. Directs the President to report to Congress annually regarding each foreign person sanctioned, the type of sanctions imposed, and the reason for their imposition. Directs the Comptroller General to assess for Congress: (1) the process to determine whether a foreign person has engaged in a sanctionable activity, whether sanctions should be imposed, and whether the identity of a sanctioned foreign person should be classified; and (2) implementation of this Act.
Title
Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2015-02-03 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E151) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB284 (Related) 2016-05-18 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Sanctions
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Sanctions
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/624/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr624/BILLS-114hr624ih.pdf |