US SB2823 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Music Modernization Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Music Modernization Act

Sponsors

Sen. Orrin Hatch [R]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R]
Sen. Christopher Coons [D]Sen. John Kennedy [R]Sen. Kamala Harris [D]Sen. Bob Corker [R]
Sen. Richard Durbin [D]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D]Sen. Mike Crapo [R]
Sen. Doug Jones [D]Sen. Thom Tillis [R]Sen. David Perdue [R]Sen. Shelley Capito [R]
Sen. Bill Nelson [D]Sen. Roy Blunt [R]Sen. Roger Wicker [R]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D]
Sen. Michael Bennet [D]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R]Sen. Tim Kaine [D]
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D]Sen. Pat Roberts [R]
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D]Sen. Patty Murray [D]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D]Sen. Cory Booker [D]
Sen. Brian Schatz [D]Sen. Joe Manchin [D]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D]Sen. Steve Daines [R]
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D]Sen. Joni Ernst [R]Sen. Todd Young [R]
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D]Sen. James Inhofe [R]Sen. John Thune [R]Sen. Richard Burr [R]
Sen. Mike Rounds [R]Sen. James Risch [R]Sen. Michael Enzi [R]Sen. Jerry Moran [R]
Sen. Tim Scott [R]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D]Sen. Deb Fischer [R]Sen. Tina Smith [D]
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D]Sen. Susan Collins [R]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D]Sen. John Boozman [R]
Sen. John Barrasso [R]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R]Sen. Edward Markey [D]Sen. Gary Peters [D]
Sen. John Hoeven [R]Sen. Angus King [I]Sen. Rob Portman [R]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D]
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D]Sen. Cory Gardner [R]Sen. Marco Rubio [R]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D]
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. James Lankford [R]Sen. Ron Johnson [R]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D]
Sen. Jon Tester [D]Sen. Mark Warner [D]Sen. Maria Cantwell [D]Sen. Joe Donnelly [D]
Sen. Jack Reed [D]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D]Sen. Robert Casey [D]Sen. Charles Schumer [D]
Sen. Robert Menendez [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17SenateBy Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
2018-09-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569.
2018-09-12SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-06-28SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-05-10SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB881 (Related) 2017-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3301 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4706 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5447 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate.
SB2334 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB2393 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB2625 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
HB1551 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-264.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback