US SB2334 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Music Modernization Act of 2018
Title
Music Modernization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S501-505) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4706 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5447 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate.
SB2823 (Related) 2018-09-17 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
HB1551 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-264.
HB5447 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate.
SB2823 (Related) 2018-09-17 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
HB1551 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-264.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commerce
Congressional agencies
Digital media
Intellectual property
Library of Congress
Licensing and registrations
Music
Performing arts
Sound recording
User charges and fees
Commerce
Congressional agencies
Digital media
Intellectual property
Library of Congress
Licensing and registrations
Music
Performing arts
Sound recording
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2334/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2334/BILLS-115s2334is.pdf |