US HB5447 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Music Modernization Act
Title
Music Modernization Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 154 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 154). (text: CR H3522-3536) |
2018-04-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3560-3561) |
2018-04-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5447. |
2018-04-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3522-3542) |
2018-04-25 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 499. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-651. |
2018-04-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 0. |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2625 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
HB881 (Related) 2017-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3301 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4706 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2334 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB2393 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB2823 (Related) 2018-09-17 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
HB1551 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-264.
HB881 (Related) 2017-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3301 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4706 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2334 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB2393 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB2823 (Related) 2018-09-17 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
HB1551 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-264.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Commerce
Congressional agencies
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Digital media
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal preemption
Government information and archives
Intellectual property
Library of Congress
Licensing and registrations
Music
Sound recording
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Appropriations
Commerce
Congressional agencies
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Digital media
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal preemption
Government information and archives
Intellectual property
Library of Congress
Licensing and registrations
Music
Sound recording
State and local government operations
User charges and fees