US HB3301 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CLASSICS Act Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act This bill provides federal copyright protection for sound recordings fixed before February 15, 1972, specifically the right to make digital transmissions. Currently, pre-1972 recordings are only covered by state law. Pre-1972 recordings will fall within the existing compulsory license system for digital transmissions, which currently only cover post-1972 recordings. The bill preempts claims under state and common law for digital transmission of pre-1972 recordings.
Title
CLASSICS Act Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-07-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2393 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
HB5447 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate.
SB2823 (Related) 2018-09-17 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
HB5447 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate.
SB2823 (Related) 2018-09-17 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-339.
Subjects
Commerce
Federal preemption
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Music
Sound recording
State and local government operations
Federal preemption
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Music
Sound recording
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3301/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3301/BILLS-115hr3301ih.pdf |