US SB2702 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect the voting rights of Native American and Alaska Native voters.
Title
Frank Harrison, Elizabeth Peratrovich, and Miguel Trujillo Native American Voting Rights Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5008 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 4 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 459) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB4 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 4 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 459) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2702/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2702/BILLS-117s2702is.pdf |