US HB5008 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-1)
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect the voting rights of Native American and Alaska Native voters.
Title
Frank Harrison, Elizabeth Peratrovich, and Miguel Trujillo Native American Voting Rights Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-08-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-08-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2702 (Related) 2021-08-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 4 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 459) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB4 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 4 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 459) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5008/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5008/BILLS-117hr5008ih.pdf |