US SB2679 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans Small Business Enhancement Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Small Business Enhancement Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-10HouseHeld at the desk.
2018-12-10HouseReceived in the House.
2018-12-06SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-12-06SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7334; text: CR S7334)
2018-12-05SenateBy Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-414.
2018-10-11SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633.
2018-10-11SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-10-11SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-04-16SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.

Same As/Similar To

HB6940 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback