US SB2661 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-172. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-172. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to designate 9-8-8 as the universal telephone number for a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline. A state may impose and collect a fee for providing 9-8-8 related services. However, this fee must be held in a designated account to be spent only in support of 9-8-8 services, and the FCC must submit an annual report on state administration of these fees. The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) and the Department of Veterans Affairs must jointly report on how to make the use of 9-8-8 operational and effective across the country, and HHS must develop a strategy to provide access to competent, specialized services for high-risk populations such as lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and queer (LGBTQ) youth; minorities; and rural individuals.
Title
National Suicide Hotline Designation Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-172. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4608-4609) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2661. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4608-4611) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mr. McNerney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-05-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-05-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2412-2413) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | S.Amdt.1585 Amendment SA 1585 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | S.Amdt.1585 Amendment SA 1585 proposed by Senator Gardner. (consideration: CR S2412-2413; text: CR S2412-2413) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2412-2414) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4194 (Related) 2020-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Science, technology, communications
State and local finance
Telephone and wireless communication
User charges and fees
Emergency communications systems
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Science, technology, communications
State and local finance
Telephone and wireless communication
User charges and fees