US SB2525 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require research and development to identify and evaluate the extent to which critical domain risks within the United States supply chain pose a substantial threat to homeland security, and for other purposes.
Title
Domains Critical to Homeland Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 671. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-272. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3264 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
SB1605 (Related) 2021-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-81.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
SB1605 (Related) 2021-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-81.