US SB2264 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Act of 1996.
Title
Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Reauthorization Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4670 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB5140 (Related) 2022-11-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB5140 (Related) 2022-11-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2264/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2264/BILLS-117s2264is.pdf |