US SB2065 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Deepfake Report Act of 2019 This bill requires the Science and Technology Directorate in the Department of Homeland Security to report at specified intervals on the state of digital content forgery technology. Digital content forgery is the use of emerging technologies, including artificial intelligence and machine learning techniques, to fabricate or manipulate audio, visual, or text content with the intent to mislead.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deepfake Report Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
2019-10-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-10-28HouseReceived in the House.
2019-10-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-10-24SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6176)
2019-09-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 197.
2019-09-10SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-93.
2019-07-24SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-07-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3600 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback