US SB2042 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Sloan Canyon National Conservation Area Act to adjust the boundary of the Sloan Canyon National Conservation Area, and for other purposes.
Title
Sloan Canyon Conservation and Lateral Pipeline Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299. |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-147. |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6209 (Related) 2024-03-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held