US HB6209 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Sloan Canyon National Conservation Area Act to adjust the boundary of the Sloan Canyon National Conservation Area, and for other purposes.
Title
Sloan Canyon Conservation and Lateral Pipeline Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-11-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2042 (Related) 2023-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299.
SB3134 (Related) 2023-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6216 (Related) 2023-11-03 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4457 (Related) 2024-06-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB3134 (Related) 2023-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6216 (Related) 2023-11-03 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4457 (Related) 2024-06-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6209/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6209/BILLS-118hr6209ih.pdf |