US SB1930 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) This bill modifies the boundary of the Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park in Georgia to include approximately eight acres identified as Wallis House and Harriston Hill. The Department of the Interior may acquire land or interests, by donation or exchange, from willing sellers only. Interior shall administer acquired lands and interests as part of the park.
Title
Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 593. |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-320. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3371 (Related) 2016-03-17 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Georgia
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Georgia
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources