US SB1910 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 117-30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 117-30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize major medical facility projects of the Department of Veterans Affairs for fiscal year 2021.
Title
Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 413 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-30. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-07-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 7 (Roll no. 225). (text: 07/26/2021 CR H3884) |
2021-07-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3932) |
2021-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1910. |
2021-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3884-3885) |
2021-07-26 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-07-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5025) |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5025) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3804 (Same As) 2021-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.