US SB1794 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Restricted Buildings and Grounds Improvement Act of 2011 - Amends the federal criminal code to revise the prohibition against entering restricted federal buildings or grounds to impose criminal penalties on anyone who knowingly enters any restricted building or grounds without lawful authority. Defines "restricted buildings or grounds" as a posted, cordoned off, or otherwise restricted area of: (1) the White House or its grounds or the Vice President's official residence or its grounds, (2) a building or grounds where the President or other person protected by the Secret Service is or will be temporarily visiting, or (3) a building or grounds so restricted due to a special event of national significance.
Title
Federal Restricted Buildings and Grounds Improvement Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2012-02-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S357-358; text as passed Senate: CR S357-358) |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 234. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - Became Public Law No: 112-98.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Presidents and presidential powers
Violent crime
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Presidents and presidential powers
Violent crime