US HB347 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Became Public Law No: 112-98.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Became Public Law No: 112-98.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Restricted Buildings and Grounds Improvement Act of 2011 [sic] - Amends the federal criminal code to revise the prohibition against entering restricted federal buildings or grounds to impose criminal penalties on anyone who knowingly enters any restricted building or grounds without lawful authority. Defines "restricted buildings or grounds" as a posted, cordoned off, or otherwise restricted area of: (1) the White House or its grounds or the Vice President's official residence or its grounds, (2) a building or grounds where the President or other person protected by the Secret Service is or will be temporarily visiting, or (3) a building or grounds so restricted due to a special event of national significance.
Title
Federal Restricted Buildings and Grounds Improvement Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 388 N: 3 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 388 N: 3 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 399 N: 3 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 388 N: 3 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 399 N: 3 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-98. |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-02-27 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 3 (Roll no. 73). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H953) |
2012-02-27 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-02-27 | Senate | The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to agree in the Senate amendment to H.R. 347. |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Mr. Smith (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H953-954, H954-955) |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S358; text as passed Senate: CR S358) |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-02-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-02-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 3 (Roll no. 149). (text: CR H1373) |
2011-02-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1375) |
2011-02-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-02-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 347. |
2011-02-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1372-1374) |
2011-02-28 | House | Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-02-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2011-02-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-9. |
2011-01-26 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2011-01-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2011-01-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1794 (Same As) 2012-02-07 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Presidents and presidential powers
Violent crime
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Presidents and presidential powers
Violent crime