US SB1681 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to promote transportation career opportunities and improve diversity in the workforce.
Title
Promoting Service in Transportation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2016 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3310 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB3067 (Related) 2021-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3310 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB3067 (Related) 2021-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1681/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1681/BILLS-117s1681is.pdf |