US HR508 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3684) to authorize funds for federal-aid highways, highway safety programs, and transit programs, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 3684) to authorize funds for Federal-Aid Highways, Highway Safety Programs, and Transit Programs, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - House - On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) H.Amdt.65 (Y: 219 N: 188 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 219 N: 190 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - On agreeing to the DeSaulnier amendment (A001) H.Amdt.65 (Y: 84 N: 325 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-06-30HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 190 (Roll no. 200). (text: CR H3316)
2021-06-30HouseH.Amdt.65 On agreeing to the DeSaulnier amendment (A001) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 84 - 325 (Roll no. 199).
2021-06-30HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3337-3338)
2021-06-30HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on agreeing to the DeSaulnier amendment and by voice vote, annouced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Reschenthaler demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be annouced.
2021-06-30HouseH.Amdt.65 On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 188 (Roll no. 198). (consideration: CR H3335-3336)
2021-06-30HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3335-3336)
2021-06-30HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on ordering the previous question on the amendment and the resolution and by voice vote, announced the noes had prevailed. Mr. DeSaulnier demaneded the the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
2021-06-30HouseH.Amdt.65 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. DeSaulnier. (consideration: CR H3322, H3335-3336, H3337-3338; text: CR H3322)
2021-06-30HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 508.
2021-06-30HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H3316-3322)
2021-06-29HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 25.
2021-06-29HouseThe resolution provides that following debate, each further amendment printed in the Rules Committee report not earlier considered as part of amendments en bloc pursuant to subsection (b) shall be considered only in the order printed in the report, may be offered only by a Member designated in the report, considered read and debatable for the time specified. The resolution provides that H.Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "July 1, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "July 30, 2021".
2021-06-29HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-75, by Mr. DeSaulnier.

Same As/Similar To

HB3684 (Related) 2021-08-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR508 (Related) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback