US SB1658 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to expand access to breastfeeding accommodations in the workplace, and for other purposes.
Title
PUMP for Nursing Mothers Act Providing Urgent Maternal Protections for Nursing Mothers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Murray with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3110 (Same As) 2021-10-26 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
HR716 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR716 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.