US SB1518 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reinforcing American-Made Products Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994 to require the Federal Trade Commission's regulation of the labeling of products as "Made in the U.S.A." or "Made in America" to supersede any state laws regarding the extent to which a product is introduced, delivered, sold, advertised, or offered for sale in interstate or foreign commerce with such a label in order to represent that the product was in whole or substantial part of domestic origin.
Title
Reinforcing American-Made Products Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 114-221. |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5092 (Related) 2016-12-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 686.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Buy American requirements
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations
Buy American requirements
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations