US HB5092 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 686.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 686.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reinforcing American-Made Products Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994 to require the Federal Trade Commission's regulation of the labeling of products as "Made in the U.S.A." or "Made in America" to supersede any state laws regarding the extent to which a product is introduced, delivered, sold, advertised, or offered for sale in interstate or foreign commerce with such a label in order to represent that the product was in whole or substantial part of domestic origin.
Title
Reinforcing American-Made Products Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 686. |
2016-12-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-876. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 21. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-09 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-06-09 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-08 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1518 (Related) 2016-03-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Buy American requirements
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations
Buy American requirements
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations