US SB1483 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 216.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 216.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
James K. Polk Presidential Home Study Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the James K. Polk Home and adjacent property in Columbia, Tennessee. In conducting this study Interior shall evaluate the national significance of the site and determine the suitability and feasibility of designating it as a unit of the National Park System.
Title
James K. Polk Presidential Home Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 216. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 114-136. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-338. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3769 (Related) 2015-10-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee