US SB1381 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 118-127.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 118-127.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the Secretary of the Interior, through the Coastal Program of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service, to work with willing partners and provide support to efforts to assess, protect, restore, and enhance important coastal landscapes that provide fish and wildlife habitat on which certain Federal trust species depend, and for other purposes.
Title
Coastal Habitat Conservation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Senate | By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 118-127. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2950 (Same As) 2024-01-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.