US SB1378 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-406. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-406. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2016 Expands the awards program for disclosures by federal employees of fraud, waste, or mismanagement that result in cost savings to the employee's agency to include identification of surplus funds or unnecessary budget authority. Directs that any savings resulting from the identification of such funds or budget authority be deposited in the Treasury and used to reduce a budget deficit or the federal debt. Permits the head of an agency to retain up to 10% of such savings for the purpose of paying cash awards to employees who identify surplus funds or unnecessary budget authority. Prohibits the payment of awards to: (1) federal officers who serve in a position at level I of the Executive Schedule; (2) the head of an agency; or (3) a commissioner, board member, or other voting member of an independent establishment.
Title
Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | Senate | By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-406. Additional views filed. |
2016-12-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 720. |
2016-12-09 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2532 (Related) 2016-11-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 646.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1378/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1378/BILLS-114s1378is.pdf |