US HB2532 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 646.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 646.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill expands the cash awards program for disclosures by federal employees of fraud, waste, or mismanagement that result in cost savings to the employee's agency to include identification of surplus salaries and expenses funds that: (1) an agency employee identifies as unnecessary, (2) the inspector general and the chief financial officer of the agency determine are not required for the purpose for which the amounts were made available, and (3) the rescission of which would not be detrimental to the full execution of the purposes for which the amounts were made available. Any savings resulting from such identifications must be deposited in the Treasury and used to reduce a budget deficit or the federal debt. But agencies may retain up to 10% of such savings for the purpose of paying cash awards to employees who identify surplus salaries and expenses funds. Each fiscal year, agencies must submit reports to the Department of the Treasury regarding: (1) the total savings achieved through disclosures of possible fraud, waste, or mismanagement and identifications of surplus salaries and expenses funds by an employee; and (2) each disclosure that has merit and the number and amount of cash awards by the agency. This information must also be included in agency budget requests submitted to the Office of Management and Budget. Treasury must report annually to Congress on federal cost saving and awards based on agency reports about such employee disclosures. The Office of Personnel Management must certify annually whether each agency's cash award program complies with this bill. Every three years, the Government Accountability Office must report on the operation of the program and any recommendations for legislative improvements. The bill prohibits the payment of awards to: (1) federal officers who serve in a position at level I of the Executive Schedule; (2) the head of an agency; or (3) a commissioner, board member, or other voting member of an independent establishment.
Title
Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 646. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-824. |
2016-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1378 (Related) 2016-12-20 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-406. Additional views filed.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations