US SB1253 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements regarding the sale and delivery of electronic nicotine delivery systems (e.g., e-cigarettes, e-hookah, e-cigars, and vape pens). Specifically, the bill subjects the sale and delivery of these systems to certain requirements, including tax, licensing, and labeling requirements; prohibits the sale and delivery of these systems to anyone under the legal age to purchase tobacco products; and requires the U.S. Postal Service to implement regulations to prohibit the mailing of these systems. The bill does not apply to products approved by the Food and Drug Administration for tobacco cessation or any other therapeutic purposes.
Title
Preventing Online Sales of E-Cigarettes to Children Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4175-4176) |
2020-07-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.2424 Amendment SA 2424 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.2424 Amendment SA 2424 proposed by Senator Feinstein for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S4174-4175; text: CR S4174-4175) To require the National Institutes of Health to conduct a study and report on the short-term and long-term health impacts of e-cigarette use by youth and young adults under 21 years of age. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4174-4176) |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2522) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3942 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Postal service
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
U.S. Postal Service
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Postal service
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
U.S. Postal Service