US HR748 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on November 6, 2023, as "National School Psychology Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on November 6, 2023, as "National School Psychology Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2023-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1569 (Same As) 2024-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR896 (Related) 2024-11-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6639-6640; text: CR S6636)
SR896 (Related) 2024-11-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6639-6640; text: CR S6636)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/748/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres748/BILLS-118hres748ih.pdf |