US HR736 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 620) to amend the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 to promote compliance through education, to clarify the requirements for demand letters, to provide for a notice and cure period before the commencement of a private civil action, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3299) to amend the Revised Statutes, the Home Owners' Loan Act, the Federal Credit Union Act, and the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to require the rate of interest on certain loans remain unchanged after transfer of the loan, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3978) to amend the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974 to modify requirements related to mortgage disclosures, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from February 16, 2018, through February 23, 2018. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 620) to amend the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 to promote compliance through education, to clarify the requirements for demand letters, to provide for a notice and cure period before the commencement of a private civil action, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3299) to amend the Revised Statutes, the Home Owners' Loan Act, the Federal Credit Union Act, and the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to require the rate of interest on certain loans remain unchanged after transfer of the loan, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3978) to amend the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974 to modify requirements related to mortgage disclosures, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from February 16, 2018, through February 23, 2018.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 620) to amend the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 to promote compliance through education, to clarify the requirements for demand letters, to provide for a notice and cure period before the commencement of a private civil action, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3299) to amend the Revised Statutes, the Home Owners' Loan Act, the Federal Credit Union Act, and the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to require the rate of interest on certain loans remain unchanged after transfer of the loan, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3978) to amend the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974 to modify requirements related to mortgage disclosures, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from February 16, 2018, through February 23, 2018.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 72 (Y: 228 N: 187 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 73 (Y: 227 N: 187 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 73 (Y: 227 N: 187 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-14 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 227 - 187 (Roll no. 73). (text: CR H1136) |
2018-02-14 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 187 (Roll no. 72). |
2018-02-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 736. |
2018-02-14 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1136-1146) |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 126. |
2018-02-13 | House | Provides for consideration of H.R. 620 and H.R. 3978 under structured rules and H.R. 3299 under a closed rule. Each bill shall be debatable for one hour. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period of February 16, 2018 through February 23, 2018. |
2018-02-13 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-559, by Mr. Collins (GA). |
Same As/Similar To
HB620 (Related) 2018-02-26 - Received in the Senate.
HR736 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3299 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3978 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR736 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3299 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3978 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.