US HR610 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of November 9, 2017, as "National Diabetes Heart Health Awareness Day", coinciding with American Diabetes Month. Expresses support for the designation of as National Diabetes Heart Health Awareness Day.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of November 9, 2017, as "National Diabetes Heart Health Awareness Day", coinciding with American Diabetes Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR324 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7120-7121; text: CR S7119-7120)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/610/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres610/BILLS-115hres610ih.pdf |