US HR591 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the joint resolution (S.J. Res. 54) relating to a national emergency declared by the President on February 15, 2019.
Title
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (S.J. Res. 54) relating to a national emergency declared by the President on February 15, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-26 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 550 (Y: 229 N: 186 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-26 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 549 (Y: 230 N: 187 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-26 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 549 (Y: 230 N: 187 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-26 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 186 (Roll no. 550). (text: CR H7999) |
2019-09-26 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 187 (Roll no. 549). (consideration: CR H8005, H8037-8038) |
2019-09-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8037-8038) |
2019-09-26 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 591, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Woodall demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2019-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 591. |
2019-09-26 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7999-8005) |
2019-09-25 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 44. |
2019-09-25 | House | Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 54 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2019-09-25 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-218, by Mr. Morelle. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR54 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 36. Record Vote Number: 325.
HR591 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR591 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.