US SJR54 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A joint resolution relating to a national emergency declared by the President of February 15, 2019. This joint resolution terminates the national emergency related to the U.S.-Mexico border, declared by the President on February 15, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution relating to a national emergency declared by the President of February 15, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Same As/Similar To

HJR46 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - The Chair announced that the bill and accompanying veto message were referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
SJR10 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1600-1601)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback